MD HB204 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the residency requirement for applicants for alcoholic beverages licenses in Harford County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement for

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2012-03-27 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-26 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-26 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-30 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2012-03-16 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2012-03-29 Returned Passed
2012-03-15 Third Reading Passed (133-0)
2012-03-13 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-13 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-12 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2012-01-25 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-25 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback