MD HB203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Decreasing the lowest maximum speed limit that Montgomery County may establish for a highway outside an urban district under certain circumstances from 25 miles an hour to 20 miles an hour.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 24-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-5) (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (135-5)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {990117/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback