MD HB203 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person in Caroline County to hunt any game bird or game mammal, except migratory game birds and wetland game birds, on a Sunday on specified property during the open season for that game bird or game mammal; and making specified conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caroline County - Sunday Hunting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (132-4)
2016-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {400517/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-03-04HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-21HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback