MD HB203 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making permanent a $50 fee for a certificate of title for a rental vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-7) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78
2015-04-02HousePassed Enrolled
2015-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (132-7)
2015-04-02HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2015-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2015-03-31SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments {829438/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2015-03-25SenateHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-16SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2015-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (133-4)
2015-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {640917/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2015-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0203?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0203f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0203t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0203e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_78_hb0203e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0203_64091701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0203_82943801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0203.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0203_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0203_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0203,h-0253&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0203,h-0737&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0203,s-0678&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback