MD HB203 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-03 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of a specified county building whenever the flag of the United States is flown; requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; and defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA Flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and County Governments - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State and County Building Grounds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2014-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {866489/1 Report Adopted
2014-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-01-29HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-16HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback