MD HB203 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision exempting specified counties from specified State licensing laws on junk dealers and scrap metal processors; exempting specified licensed dealers and pawnbrokers from the scope of specified State licensing laws on junk dealers and scrap metal processors; repealing specified licensing provisions for Calvert County junk dealers and scrap metal processors; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - State Licensing Laws - Applicability

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-12 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-02 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2011-04-01 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-01 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-04 Favorable Report by Finance
2011-03-22 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-21 First Reading Finance
2011-04-03 Returned Passed
2011-03-18 Third Reading Passed (133-4)
2011-03-16 Second Reading Passed
2011-03-16 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-03-15 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2011-02-02 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-01-28 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback