MD HB202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court after a certain finding of incompetency or not criminally responsible due to a mental disorder to order the Maryland Department of Health as soon as possible after the defendant's admission, but not later than 48 hours, to evaluate a defendant, to develop a treatment plan, and to make a determination as to whether the defendant is a danger to self or others under certain circumstances; requiring a panel to convene within 9 days after a certain individual's refusal of medication for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation
Sponsors
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. April Rose [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {672716/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drugs
Education
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Time
Assessments
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drugs
Education
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Time