MD HB202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a private lender to provide capital for a commercial loan provided under a local clean energy loan program; providing that, with the express consent of any holder of a mortgage or deed of trust on the property, a county or municipality may collect loan payments owed on a commercial loan to a private lender or to a county or municipality, and specified administrative costs, through a surcharge on a property owner's property tax bill; etc.
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-2) (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-2) (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2014-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713194/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Counties
Deeds
Energy Matters
Fees
Financial Institutions
Liens
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Counties
Deeds
Energy Matters
Fees
Financial Institutions
Liens
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property