MD HB202 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law relating to discrimination in the employment of public school employees in the State to conform to other provisions of State law governing discrimination in employment.
Title
Education - Discrimination Prohibited - Protected Classes
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] |
Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (42-3) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (125-10) | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |