MD HB201 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a member of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System who is subject to the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit is eligible to purchase service credit for a specified period of employment under specified circumstances.
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270 |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Credit
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers