MD HB200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for enforcement only as a secondary offense for a violation of the requirement to maintain vehicle registration plates to be free from foreign material and to be clearly legible.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 106 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-9) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {920710/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB859 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 107
Subjects
Citations
Codes
Crimes and Punishments
Law Enforcement
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Codes
Crimes and Punishments
Law Enforcement
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |