MD HB20 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing for archery hunters in Calvert County and St. Mary's County a specified safety zone extending for 50 yards from a dwelling house, residence, church, or any other building or camp occupied by human beings within which archery hunting may not take place except under specified circumstances.
Title
Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-3) |
2016-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-07-20 | House | Pre-filed |