MD HB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study certain matters related to low-barrier shelters and make certain recommendations on volunteering; requiring the Task Force, by December 31, 2019, to report its findings and recommendations to the Mayor of Baltimore City, the Baltimore City Council, the Governor, and the General Assembly; terminating the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent Housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-11-20HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback