MD HB2 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "grower" to mean an entity that cultivates or packages medical cannabis and is authorized to provide cannabis to certain entities; establishing a Compassionate Use Fund to provide access to medical cannabis for certain individuals; altering the number of medical cannabis growers that may be licensed; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly beginning December 1, 2024, on the number of licenses necessary to meet the demand for medical cannabis by certain qualifying patients; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-5) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-15) (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {433229/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted (41-3) (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {923424/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (29-16) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {473326/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (38-7) (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {153322/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (42-3) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {983125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (23-23) (Y: 24 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-16) (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (40-5)
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (118-15)
2018-04-07HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateSenators Feldman, Benson, and Reilly
2018-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2018-04-05HouseDelegates Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and Kipke
2018-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {153322/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (42-3)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {433229/1 (Senator Zirkin)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {473326/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (38-7)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {183927/2 (Senator Muse) Withdrawn
2018-04-04SenateMotion Reconsider Floor Amendment {183927/2 (Senator Muse) (Senator Feldman) Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {923424/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (29-16)
2018-04-03SenateSpecial Order until 4/4 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
2018-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {923424/1 (Senator Ready)
2018-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {183927/2 (Senator Muse) Adopted
2018-04-03SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
2018-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {183927/1 (Senator Muse) Withdrawn
2018-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {983125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (23-23)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {793121/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {743822/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {517177/3 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (121-16)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-02HouseSpecial Order until 3/6 (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted
2018-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {326889/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-01-15HouseHearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-10HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2017-09-25HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0002?ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0002f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0002t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0002e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_598_hb0002e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_32688901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_51717703.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_74382201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_79312101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_98312501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_18392701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_18392702.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_92342401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_15332201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_43322901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_47332601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_25362701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_72332701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0002.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0002_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0256.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0002_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1038.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1064.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1065.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1066.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1067.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1068.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0002_72332701.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1345.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1267.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback