MD HB2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without specified qualifying children to claim the credit; allowing specified individuals to claim the credit without regard to a specified age limitation; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-08-01 | House | Pre-filed |