MD HB199 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing more than one grant for a senior citizen activity center from the Senior Citizen Activities Centers Capital Improvement Grants Program if the sum of grants made for any single center does not exceed $800,000 in any 15-year period.
Title
Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |