MD HB197 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program to provide grants to public schools to purchase technology to allow students with medical conditions to participate in classrooms remotely if in-person attendance is not possible; requiring the State Department of Education to implement and administer the Program; authorizing the Governor to include in the State budget an appropriation to the Program; and authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations.
Title
Education - Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program - Establishment (Peyton's Bill)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-17 | House | Floor Amendment {273025/1 (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted |
2017-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {295260/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Education, State Department of
Grants
Health
Industry and Technology
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students
Education, State Department of
Grants
Health
Industry and Technology
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students