MD HB197 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Barbers and the State Board of Cosmetologists (boards) in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to a specified date the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the boards; prohibiting the boards from setting specified fees that exceed a specified amount; requiring the boards to adopt regulations regarding specified curriculum standards; etc.
Title
State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension and
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apprentices
Auditors and Audits
Barbers
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Higher Education
Inspections
Licenses
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Auditors and Audits
Barbers
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Higher Education
Inspections
Licenses
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset