MD HB194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain individuals who sign individual tax returns as preparers are not exempt from the requirement to register with the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers.
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorneys
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Exemptions
Licenses
Registration
Signatures
Tax Preparers
Tax Returns
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Exemptions
Licenses
Registration
Signatures
Tax Preparers
Tax Returns