MD HB190 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Defining the term "failing on-site sewage disposal system" for certain provisions of law to mean an on-site sewage disposal system or a cesspool, or a component of an on-site sewage disposal system or a cesspool, that is a threat to the public health due to certain conditions; providing that the Act may not be construed to preempt or prevail over any county ordinance, law, or rule that provides a more stringent definition of the term "failing on-site sewage disposal system"; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-4) (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-5) (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (130-4)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (41-4)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {324035/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (129-5)
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseSpecial Order until 03/06 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {950911/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0190&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0190f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0190t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0190e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_342_hb0190e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0190_95091101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0190_32403501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0190.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0190_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0355.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0190_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1334.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1148.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback