MD HB190 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission develop standards for the mandatory psychological evaluation of a certain law enforcement officer; requiring the Commission to develop standards for the mandatory psychological consultation with a certain law enforcement officer; repealing a requirement that a certain psychological evaluation for a police officer certification be conducted by a psychologist approved by the Commission; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {612616/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Death
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training Commission
Psychologists
Public Safety
Death
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training Commission
Psychologists
Public Safety