MD HB189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to defer to, rather than use information provided by, the insurance regulatory agency of a state or the National Association of Insurance Commissioners committee process in the certification or rating of an assuming insurer under certain circumstances; requiring that certain credit be allowed when certain reinsurance is ceded to certain assuming insurers that have their head offices or are domiciled in and licensed in a reciprocal jurisdiction; etc.
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863093/1 Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB167 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 101
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Arbitration
Boundaries
Certifications
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Credit
Disclosure
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
International Affairs
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Publications
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Security Interests
Time
Arbitration
Boundaries
Certifications
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Credit
Disclosure
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
International Affairs
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Publications
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Security Interests
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 5 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 5 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 5 | 917 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |