MD HB189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 10 to 15 the number of Class BLX licenses that a person may hold in Prince George's County; and requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to take certain actions before issuing a certain Class BLX license to a license holder that already holds certain other Class BLX licenses.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX Licenses PG 304-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants