MD HB189 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing obsolete provisions of law that required certain insurers to provide the Maryland Insurance Commissioner with certain information and documents regarding slavery era insurance policies and required the Commissioner to issue a certain report on slavery era insurance policies; and requiring a copy of the 2012 report be made available on the Maryland Insurance Administration's website and a copy be maintained at the Thurgood Marshall Library at the University of Maryland School of Law.
Title
Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803597/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Governor
Historical Matters
Human Rights
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Minorities
Reports
Discrimination
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Governor
Historical Matters
Human Rights
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Minorities
Reports