MD HB189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing up to five hospitals in the State to participate in a substance use treatment demonstration program; providing that the purpose of the demonstration program is to identify best practices to identify patients potentially in need of treatment, screen patients, and refer patients in need of substance use treatment to specified services; requiring each participating hospital to operate an inpatient and outpatient substance use treatment program or ensure that specified treatment services are made available; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Assessments
Continuing Care
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Continuing Care
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Substance Abuse