MD HB188 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the education requirements that an applicant for licensure by the State Acupuncture Board must achieve to be issued a license if the license is issued on or before May 31, 2026, and if the license is issued on or after June 1, 2026.
Title
Acupuncture Licensure Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 46-0 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 46-0 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733724/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-12 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB120 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 1A | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |