MD HB188 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility criteria for membership on the State Board of Architects and the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors; requiring at least three members of the State Board of Architects to hold a professional degree from an architecture program accredited by the National Architectural Accrediting Board; requiring one member of the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors to be either a licensed property line surveyor or a professional land surveyor; etc.
Title
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Architects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Licenses
Surveyors
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Licenses
Surveyors