MD HB187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain revenue, fees, and examination and investigation fees and assessments relating to the licensure of collection agencies, consumer lenders, installment lenders, sales finance companies, mortgage lenders, check cashing services, and credit services businesses to be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund; stating the purpose of the Fund is to cover the direct and indirect costs of fulfilling the statutory and regulatory duties of the Commissioner and the State Collection Agency Licensing Board; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867970/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733894/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Credit
Debt Collection
Examinations
Fees
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Credit
Debt Collection
Examinations
Fees
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations