MD HB187 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Applying to Cecil County and Queen Anne's County specified provisions authorizing the governing body of a county to contract with another governmental entity for the joint or cooperative performance of any governmental function; and authorizing the governing body of a county to accept specified gifts or grants from the federal or State government and to use the gifts and grants for specified purposes.
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsors
Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Andrew Cassilly [R] | Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] |
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228 |
2015-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Cecil County
Contracts
Counties - Generally
Federal Government
Gifts
Grants
Interstate Affairs
Queen Anne's County
State Aid
Contracts
Counties - Generally
Federal Government
Gifts
Grants
Interstate Affairs
Queen Anne's County
State Aid