MD HB183 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on residential or commercial real property equipped with security camera systems for a certain purpose; specifying the amount of the property tax credit, subject to certain limitations; authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157
2019-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback