MD HB183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an Executive Branch agency to ban or regulate the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Baltimore County; providing a specified exception; and repealing a specified termination provision relating to prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in Baltimore County public high schools.
Title
Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {194636/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {525060/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Education
Education - Local Bills
Food
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Sunset
Education
Education - Local Bills
Food
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Sunset