MD HB183 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legalizing the 2015 Edition of the Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws and any supplement to the extent to which that code or supplement contains laws enacted by the General Assembly.
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |