MD HB1804 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Academic Health Center Immunotherapy Research Fund to provide matching grants to statewide academic health centers for immunotherapy research only; requiring a statewide academic health center to dedicate funding from other sources for certain purposes to qualify for a grant; requiring the Governor, for fiscal year 2020, to include in the budget bill an appropriation of $2,500,000 for a grant to the University of Maryland School of Medicine for immunotherapy research which does not require a matching fund; etc.
Title
Health – Medical Research Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {114564/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Interest
Investments
Medical Research
Operating Budget
Partnerships
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Interest
Investments
Medical Research
Operating Budget
Partnerships
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes