MD HB18 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified persons from using, allowing to be used, or selling specified lead wheel weights after specified dates; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations that at a minimum list environmentally safe lead-free wheel weights; requiring the Department to inform specified persons regarding the requirements under the regulations; providing for the enforcement of the Act, including the required issuance of a warning for an initial violation; etc.
Title
Environment - Lead Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2009-09-24 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Automotive Repair
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Recycling
Rules and Regulations
Automotive Repair
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Recycling
Rules and Regulations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0018.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0018f.pdf |