MD HB178 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a penalty of up to $1,000 and up to 1 year of imprisonment or both for a violation of the Act; providing an increased points assessment for certain motor vehicle violations related to participation in a race or speed contest; providing for an assessment of 8 points for an individual participating in a race or speed contest on a highway or, if the speed contest results in serious bodily injury to another person, an assessment of 12 points; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (128-0)
2021-02-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {960012/1 Adopted
2021-02-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-10-29HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB408 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation16402(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation211116(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback