MD HB178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from 11 a.m. to 10 a.m. the starting time on Sunday for the sale of alcoholic beverages for specified license holders in Frederick County for specified purposes.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Frederick County
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Frederick County
Retail Sales