MD HB177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting an individual who kills or wounds a black bear in defense of the life of a honey bee in a honey bee colony managed by the individual on the individual's property from specified penalties, subject to a specified exception; and establishing that the exemption applies only if the individual has installed and properly maintained an electric fence.
Title
Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Managed Honey Bee Colonies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-19) (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-37) (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Rejected (49-81) (Y: 49 N: 81 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-37) (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Rejected (49-81) (Y: 49 N: 81 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-19) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {194237/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-37) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | Floor Amendment {483626/1 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted |
2017-03-08 | House | Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Rejected (49-81) |
2017-03-07 | House | Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {210719/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |