MD HB177 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the subtraction modification under the State income tax from $5,000 to $10,000 of military retirement income received for retirees at least 65 years old on the last day of the taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years Old
Sponsors
Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Joseph Vallario [D] | Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |