MD HB176 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain fees charged by a sheriff for service of process of certain papers.
Title
Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542 |
2022-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-14) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553829/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2021-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Arrests
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Process Serving
Search and Seizure
Sheriffs
Arrests
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Process Serving
Search and Seizure
Sheriffs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |