MD HB176 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2002 and 2009 to extend the deadline for the Board of Directors of CHI Centers, Inc. to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided for a specified grant; requiring that the Board of Public Works expend or encumber the proceeds of the loans by June 1, 2014; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2002 and 2009 - Montgomery County -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-02 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading Passed (128-5) | |
2012-02-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Emergency Bills
Montgomery County
State Bonds
Developmental Disabilities
Emergency Bills
Montgomery County
State Bonds