MD HB176 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing from 9 years to 5 years the number of years required after retirement for retirees of the Employees' Retirement or Pension System or the Teachers' Retirement or Pension System to be exempt from an earnings offset of their retirement allowance when reemployed by specified employers.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees - Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-10 | Hearing 3/11 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2011-03-10 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m. | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2011-02-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-01-28 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-01-27 | First Reading Appropriations |