MD HB175 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a program to be administered by the Maryland Transportation Authority for State residents to resolve unpaid video tolls and related civil penalties; requiring the Authority to notify a resident who may be eligible to participate in the program; requring the Authority to waive 70% of delinquent video tolls and related civil penalties that became delinquent before July 1, 2022 and require a resident to obtain an E-ZPass by June 30, 2024 and pay a certain remaining balance; authorizing a monthly installment plan; etc.
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority – Program for Payment of Unpaid Video Tolls
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-10-04 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Civil Actions
Communications
Debt Collection
Fees
internet
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Civil Actions
Communications
Debt Collection
Fees
internet
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0175?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0175f.pdf |