MD HB173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an Invest Maryland Program; establishing the Maryland Venture Fund Authority in the Department of Business and Economic Development; providing for the membership, terms, and duties of the Authority; requiring members of the Authority to file financial disclosures; allowing specified companies to purchase credits against the insurance premium tax in order to fund qualified investments in businesses in the State; providing for the administration of the credit by the Department; etc.
Title
Business and Economic Development - Invest Maryland Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Madaleno) Adopted (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {703121/1 Rejected (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Haddaway) {443220/1 Rejected (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Aumann) {353721/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Eckardt) {123528/1 Rejected (Y: 47 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Miller W) {633827/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Miller W) {783328/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Madaleno) Adopted (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {703121/1 Rejected (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Haddaway) {443220/1 Rejected (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Aumann) {353721/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Eckardt) {123528/1 Rejected (Y: 47 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Miller W) {633827/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment (Miller W) {783328/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) | |
2011-04-06 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted (34-13) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Floor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-09 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-04 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (92-43) | |
2011-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (94-43) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) Rejected (48-86) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Haddaway-Riccio) Rejected (52-84) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (46-90) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Eckardt) Rejected (47-90) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Miller W) Rejected (46-90) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Miller W) Rejected (46-90) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-26 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Business Trusts
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contracts
Corporations
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Fees
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Investments
Limited Liability Companies
Notices
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Tax Credits
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Business Trusts
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contracts
Corporations
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Fees
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Investments
Limited Liability Companies
Notices
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Tax Credits