MD HB172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that an archery hunter in Montgomery County use a tree stand when hunting any wild bird or mammal within a certain distance of certain buildings; and requiring that an archery hunter in Montgomery County be in an elevated position when hunting any wild bird or mammal within 50 to 100 yards of a dwelling house, residence, church, public or nonpublic school, or certain other buildings.
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Boundaries
Housing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Montgomery County
Places of Worship
Private Schools
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Birds
Boundaries
Housing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Montgomery County
Places of Worship
Private Schools
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools