MD HB172 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Stating that the Act seeks to deconcentrate poverty by providing opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in neighborhoods other than the neighborhoods in which they are currently and disproportionately residing; expanding the housing policy of the state to include fair housing regardless of source of income; requiring the owner of an apartment complex to rent or make available 15% of the units to persons receiving housing assistance vouchers; prohibiting specified discrimination based on source of income; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-53) (Y: 88 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (95-46) (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {313123/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-87) (Y: 44 N: 87 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {433525/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (42-84) (Y: 42 N: 84 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {903326/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (46-86) (Y: 46 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {583128/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84) (Y: 47 N: 84 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (88-53)
2017-03-20HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (95-46)
2017-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-20HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
2017-03-20HouseFloor Amendment {313123/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-87)
2017-03-20HouseFloor Amendment {433525/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (42-84)
2017-03-20HouseFloor Amendment {903326/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (46-86)
2017-03-20HouseFloor Amendment {583128/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84)
2017-03-20HouseSpecial Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2017-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {610419/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-19HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0172&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0172f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0172t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0172_31312301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0172_43352501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0172_58312801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0172_61041901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0172_90332601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0172.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0172_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0172,h-0759&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0172,h-0760&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0172,h-0761&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0172,h-0762&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0172,h-0834&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0172,h-0835&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback