MD HB1717 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "personal information" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing the protection of information by government agencies to exclude voter registration numbers.
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration Numbers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zucker) Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {235862/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Political Parties
Privacy
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Voting
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Political Parties
Privacy
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Voting