MD HB171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a retail beer and wine license issued in Montgomery County authorizes the sale of shochu and soju under certain terms and conditions; and defining "shochu" as a Japanese alcoholic beverage that contains not more than 24% alcohol by volume and "soju" as a Korean alcoholic beverage that contains not more than 24% of alcohol by volume.
Title
Montgomery County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Shochu and Soju MC 20-18
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Montgomery County
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Montgomery County
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures