MD HB171 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with specified persons, to study, review, explore, identify, and make recommendations regarding specified matters that relate to the diversion of yard waste, food residuals, and other organic materials from refuse disposal facilities, including the status of infrastructure in the State; requiring the Department to provide a final report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by July 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {364035/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-28 | House | Floor Amendment {913024/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {510316/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Food
General Assembly
Governor
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Food
General Assembly
Governor
Refuse Disposal
Reports