MD HB170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "borrower" for the purpose of provisions of law governing the Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program to include an eligible State agency; altering the purpose of the Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program to include providing financial assistance in the form of low interest and zero interest loans to certain organizations, including to State agencies for certain projects and including projects to reduce greenhouse gas emissions; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Eligible Borrowers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (133-6)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {533998/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback