MD HB170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the State corporate income tax rate from 8.25% to 6% beginning in tax year 2014.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |